judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CALDWELL VS. EL CORTEZ HOTEL & CASINO

Case Information: 43959
Short Caption:CALDWELL VS. EL CORTEZ HOTEL & CASINOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A468650Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/17/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-17247
10/11/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Clark County Clerk regarding transmission of documents.
10/20/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Order filed July 2, 2004; Motion to Appeal filed July 4, 2004; and Notice of Entry of Order July 6, 2004. 04-19415
10/26/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "As we lack jurisdiction, " . . . we dismiss this appeal." fn3[We note that appellant's failure to pay the supreme court filing fee could constitute an independent basis on which to dismiss this appeal.] SNP04D-RR/WM/MD 04-19748
11/23/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-19908
11/23/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/06/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 29, 2004. 04-19908