Case: 18-0539
18-0539
06/12/2018
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
TYLER CRAIG AND TEJAS VENDING, L.P.
TEJAS PROMOTIONS, LLC
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/02/2019 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner's Reply Brief | Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tyler Craig, et al. | |||||
07/18/2019 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tejas Promotions, LLC. | |||||
05/29/2019 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tyler Craig, et al. | |||||
01/03/2019 | Reply to Response to Petition filed | Petitioner | Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Tyler Craig and Tejas Vending, L.P. | |||||
12/19/2018 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Tejas Promotions, LLC. | |||||
08/17/2018 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Tyler Craig, et al. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/14/2019 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
10/04/2019 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
08/02/2019 | Brief on the Merits | Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tyler Craig, et al. | ||||||
07/18/2019 | Brief on the Merits | Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tejas Promotions, LLC. | ||||||
06/18/2019 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response brief is due July 18, 2019; Reply brief is due August 2, 2019. |
| ||||
06/18/2019 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tejas Promotions, LLC. | ||||||
05/29/2019 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tyler Craig, et al. | ||||||
04/26/2019 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is due on May 29, 2019. Response Brief is due on June 18, 2019. Reply Brief is due on July 3, 2019. |
| ||||
04/26/2019 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tyler Craig, et al. | ||||||
03/29/2019 | Brief on the Merits Requested | Brief on the merits requested: Petitioner's brief due no later than April 29, 2019; Response brief due May 20, 2019; Reply brief due June 4, 2019. |
| |||||
01/03/2019 | Reply to Response to Petition filed | Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Tyler Craig and Tejas Vending, L.P. | ||||||
12/19/2018 | Response to Petition | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Tejas Promotions, LLC. | ||||||
11/19/2018 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response is due on December 19, 2018. |
| ||||
11/19/2018 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Tejas Promotions, LLC. | ||||||
10/19/2018 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Response Request to Petition for Review due on November 19, 2018. |
| |||||
09/18/2018 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
08/17/2018 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Tyler Craig, et al. |
| |||||
07/06/2018 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petition for Review is due on August 17, 2018. |
| ||||
07/06/2018 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Bruce Craig, et al. |
| |||||
06/12/2018 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review granted. Petition for Review is due no later than July 18, 2018. |
| ||||
06/12/2018 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Bruce Craig, et al. |
| |||||
06/12/2018 | Clerk's Record | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
11/14/2019 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Tejas Promotions, LLC | Respondent | Ms. Brittney K. Mollman Mr. Matthew R. Beatty Mr. Michael L. Navarre |
Tejas Vending, LP | Petitioner | Mr. Glenn Keith Weichert Mr. Douglas W. Alexander Mr. Darryl Wayne Pruett Mr. J. Woodfin Jones Mr. George Verner Basham III |
Craig, Bruce | Petitioner | Mr. J. Woodfin Jones Mr. Darryl Wayne Pruett Mr. Douglas W. Alexander Mr. Glenn Keith Weichert Mr. George Verner Basham III |
Craig, Tyler | Petitioner | Mr. J. Woodfin Jones Mr. George Verner Basham III Mr. Glenn Keith Weichert Mr. Darryl Wayne Pruett Mr. Douglas W. Alexander |
Court of Appeals Information:
03-16-00611-CV
Rev & Ren/Pt and Rem/Pt
550 SW3d 287, 05-03-18
3rd Court of Appeals
Honorable Robert Harrison Pemberton
Trial Court Information
261st District Court
Travis
Honorable Rhonda G. Hurley
D-1-GN-16-001959