Case Information: 90-AA-1369 | |||
Short Caption: | ANTHONY WAYNE WOODALL V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 11/28/1990 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 11/28/1990 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 11/28/1990 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 02/26/1991 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 06/18/1991 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 09/17/1991 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | Anthony Wayne Woodall | Y | Pro Se | N | |||||
Respondent | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | WOODALL, ANTHONY WAYNE DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 11/28/90 ORD: GRANTG PETNR'S NOTE - 01 MO FOR LV TO PROC IFP & CLK TO NOTE - 02 FL LODGED PFR, DSA & REC ON NOTE - 02 APPEAL; F/O BRF OF PETRN'S DUE NOTE - 03 TO BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 03 | |||
11/05/1990 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
11/05/1990 | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/05/1990 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/05/1990 | RECEIVED PETITION FOR REVIEW AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/15/1990 | RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL (MFP STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/28/1990 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
11/28/1990 | PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/28/1990 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3. GW PANELRO SCDATE 110790 SCHPRD TO | |||
11/28/1990 | PETITION FOR REVIEW GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/28/1990 | RECORD ON APPEAL GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/21/1990 | PETITIONER'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 010891 SCHPRD BA | |||
01/25/1991 | RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/26/91 AJ PANEL SCDATE 012591 SCHPRD BE | |||
02/21/1991 | RESP MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/25/1991 | ORDER GRNT RESP MO X TM FL BRF TO 02/26/91. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 021491 SCHPRD GR | |||
02/26/1991 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
02/26/1991 | RESPONDENT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 022691 SCHPRD BE | |||
03/25/1991 | ORDER GRANTG RSPNT MO TO SUPPMNT REC & CLK TO FL EXHB SPECIFIED IN RSPNT MO AS A SUPMNTL REC. GW PANELRO SCDATE 030891 SCHPRD TO | |||
03/25/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD DOCUMENTARY EXH SPECIFIED IN RESPNT AFORESAID MO. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/18/1991 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
06/18/1991 | SUBMITTED PANELRGFEFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/19/1991 | AFFIRMED MOJ AF DECISION ON REVIEW PANELRGFEFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/19/1991 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
09/17/1991 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |