Case: 12-11-00135-CR
12-11-00135-CR
05/04/2011
Aggravated Assault
Ricky Dalon Rains
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/13/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
08/25/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/02/2012 | Case stored | | |
11/02/2012 | Mandate issued | | |
10/22/2012 | Case returned from higher court | | |
09/19/2012 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | |
08/17/2012 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |
08/17/2012 | Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals | | |
08/17/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/30/2012 | Petition for discretionary review was not filed | | |
05/25/2012 | Notice filed | | |
05/18/2012 | Late compliance notice | | |
05/17/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/15/2012 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
04/30/2012 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed | |
12/01/2011 | Submitted | | |
11/10/2011 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied | | |
10/17/2011 | Prescreened | | |
10/13/2011 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/13/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |
09/28/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/27/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
08/25/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |
08/10/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/05/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
07/07/2011 | Clerks record filed | | |
07/06/2011 | Reporters record filed | | |
07/06/2011 | Telephone call received | | |
06/09/2011 | Notice of late record | | |
06/08/2011 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/03/2011 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |
05/23/2011 | Docketing statement filed | | |
05/18/2011 | Notice of late docketing statement | | |
05/05/2011 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk | | |
05/04/2011 | Court packet sent to parties | | |
05/04/2011 | Fax received | | |
05/04/2011 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |
04/21/2011 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |
04/06/2011 | Trial court certification filed | | |
04/06/2011 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/02/2012 | Case Stored | Case stored |
11/02/2037 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Rains, Ricky Dalon | Criminal - Appellant | Mr. James F. Keegan |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Mr. Bennie L. Schiro |
Trial Court Information
411th District Court
Trinity
Honorable Robert Hill Trapp
9554
20 Years/TDCJ-CID - Concurrently & $10,000 Fine