judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GILL (KEVIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36280
Short Caption:GILL (KEVIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36405
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR991021Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/14/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/14/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10114
08/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. These are proper person appeals from orders of the district court denying appellant's motions for transcripts at public expense and motions for finding of contempt. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML. Nos. 36280, 36281, 36282 (Cases are not consolidated). 00-13356
08/29/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13690
08/29/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/07/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. 00-13690