judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FARROW (VICKIE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36279
Short Caption:FARROW (VICKIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR981944Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/14/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/14/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-10112
07/17/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: on or before July 24, 2000. 00-12246
07/17/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: May 3, 1999, May 25, 2000. Court Reporter: Debbie Vieira. 00-12289
07/20/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-12529
07/20/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-12530
08/10/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-13921
09/06/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-15691
10/03/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-15798
10/03/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 16, 2000. 00-15798