judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LESLIE STEWART v. DAVID B. STEWART

Case Heading (S-07-0134)
Case Number:S-07-0134Case Docketed On:06/25/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:LESLIE STEWART v. DAVID B. STEWART
Full Title:LESLIE STEWART, Appellant (Defendant), v. DAVID B. STEWART, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLeslie StewartWilliam R. Fix
AppelleeDavid B. Stewart Pro Se

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/25/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/25/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/25/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/25/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/07/2007Event - Phone Call. Received call from appellant. She claimed to have just received the docketing letter. She will request an extension of time to file brief. Told her to overnight the request to us for arrival Friday, as brief is due on Monday, 8/13/07.EventPhone CallFinal
08/09/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/09/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/14/2007Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by Willaim R. Fix to appear on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
09/14/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/18/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/29/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
10/30/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
10/30/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal