Case: 16-0632
16-0632
08/22/2016
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE ELDOR BRISH
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/14/2016 | Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | Relator | Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Eldor Brish. | |||||
10/06/2016 | Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed | Real Parties in Interest | Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Marchelle Brish. | |||||
08/22/2016 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Relator | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Eldor Brish. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/27/2017 | Case Stored | e-stored | | |||||
12/16/2016 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
10/21/2016 | Motion to Stay Disposed | Denied | Relator's Motion for Emergency Relief denied |
| ||||
10/14/2016 | Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Eldor Brish. | ||||||
10/13/2016 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Ms. Kostun's office informed the Court that the reply will be filed later this evening. | | |||||
10/13/2016 | Call received | Ms. Kostun's office informed the court that the reply to response to mandamus will be filed by 5pm today. | | |||||
10/13/2016 | Supplement to Motion filed | Supplement to Relator’s Motion for Emergency Relief filed on behalf of Eldor Brish. | ||||||
10/12/2016 | Call received | Ms. Kostun's office informed the court that the parties are agreeing to delay the hearing date. A supplement to the motion to stay and a brief reply to the mandamus will be filed by noon tomorrow. | | |||||
10/06/2016 | Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed | Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Marchelle Brish. | ||||||
10/05/2016 | Motion to Stay Filed | Motion for Emergency Stay filed on behalf of Eldor Brish. | ||||||
10/05/2016 | Call received | Motion to Stay will be filed no later than today. | | |||||
09/30/2016 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to petition for writ of mandamus due no later than October 31, 2016. |
| |||||
09/08/2016 | Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates | Vacation notice of September 12 through 16, 2016 filed on behalf of Marchelle Brish. | ||||||
08/30/2016 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
08/22/2016 | Case Record Filed | Mandamus Record filed on behalf of Eldor Brish. | ||||||
08/22/2016 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Eldor Brish. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
01/27/2017 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Brish, Marchelle | Real Party in Interest | Ms. Jo Ann Merica Mr. Samuel Mills George |
Brish, Eldor | Relator | Mr. Samuel E. Bassett Michelle Miciotto Kostun Mr. Jerry Ed Bain |
Court of Appeals Information:
03-16-00478-CV
Denied
___ SW3d ___, 07-29-16
3rd Court of Appeals
Honorable Melissa Young Goodwin
Trial Court Information
200th District Court
Travis
Honorable Timothy M. Sulak
D-1-FM-16-003293