judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SAVAGE VS. PIERSON (NRAP 5)

Case Information: 45956
Short Caption:SAVAGE VS. PIERSON (NRAP 5)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - NRAP 5 - U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:10/09/2006 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:10/09/2006How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/20/2005Order/IncomingFiled Order Certifying Question to Nevada Supreme Court. Received from U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nevada. 05-18630
10/12/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to Pay Filing Fee. Appellant and respondent shall each, within 10 days, tender to the clerk of this court the sum of $125.00, representing one half of the filing fee. 05-20146
10/19/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $125.00 from David Rankine - check no. 8775.
10/21/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $125.00 from Beesley, Peck & Matteoni, Ltd.--check no. 15554.
01/09/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We conclude that briefing is appropriate in this case. Opening brief and appendix due: 30 days. 06-00426
02/08/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-02868
02/08/2006AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 06-02869
02/27/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. 06-04387
03/29/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. 06-06596
08/08/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on October 9, 2006, at 9:30 a.m. (En Banc)
09/26/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
10/06/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of New Firm for Appellant's Counsel. Attorneys Bruce Beesley and Tricia Darby have joined the law firm of Beckley Singleton. 06-20555
10/06/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Daniel Polsenberg of Beckley Singleton associates as counsel for appellant. 06-20556
10/09/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/03/2007Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Question answered." fn1[This case was submitted for decision before January 1, 2007. Thus, only those justices remaining on the court who previously heard this matter participated in this decision. The Honorable Michael A. Cherry, Justice, and the Honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Justice, therefore did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Douglas, J. We concur: Maupin, C.J., Gibbons, Hardesty and Parraguirre, JJ. 123 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 12. EN BANC 07-09856
05/29/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-11370
05/29/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 30, 2007. 07-11370