judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHANG VS. ESPINO-BERNAL

Case Information: 45955
Short Caption:CHANG VS. ESPINO-BERNALCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A448446Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/07/2005 / Ashleman, I.R.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Hutchison & Steffen - check no. 6491.
09/19/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-18620
10/03/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-19580
10/07/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: I.R. Ashleman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/27/2005MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal against Respondent Jesus Hernandez-Zamora. 05-21346
11/01/2005Notice/Outgoing Letter. I.R. Ashleman (Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal Against Respondent Jesus Hernandez-Zamora).
11/18/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Order Partially Dismissing Appeal. This appeal is dismissed as to appellants and respondent Jesus Hernandez-Zamor only. NRAP 42(b). 05-22798
12/12/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 05-24206
12/19/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 05-24550
01/20/2006MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 06-01487
01/25/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 06-01876
01/25/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.