judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BACON (PERCY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45976
Short Caption:BACON (PERCY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45615 , 45652 , 45975 , 45983 , 46069 , 46576 , 47360 , 48147 , 48169 , 48399 , 50202 , 50403 , 50491 , 50600 , 50612 , 53420 , 53492 , 53767 , 53768 , 53804 , 53886 , 53915 , 53927 , 54102 , 54450 , 54479 , 54680 , 54741 , 54742 , 54874 , 55097 , 55440 , 55456 , 55540 , 55767 , 55778 , 56106 , 56449 , 56601 , 57017 , 57080 , 57214 , 57541 , 57659 , 57660 , 57661 , 58954 , 60161 , 61076 , 61280 , 61778 , 61779 , 61780 , 61803 , 61898 , 61899 , 61971 , 62026 , 62043 , 62166 , 62240 , 62681 , 63217 , 64428 , 67110 , 67701 , 67802 , 67803 , 67804 , 67824 , 68012 , 68159 , 68639 , 68852 , 78120
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C212233Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-18720
10/17/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn2[We have received all proper person documents submitted in this matter, and conclude that no relief is warranted.] NNP06R-MD/RR/RP 05-20403
11/15/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-20708
11/15/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 22, 2005. 05-20708