judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JORDAN (ANSELL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45957
Short Caption:JORDAN (ANSELL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41414 , 45030 , 50954
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR021987Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/05/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-18658
09/30/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 05-19515
11/02/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: February 12, 2003. Court Reporter: Debbie Vieira. 05-21623
12/05/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 5. 05-23710
12/05/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/21/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn13[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-03759
03/21/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-04382
03/21/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/30/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 22, 2006. 06-04382