judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAMS (RONALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45991
Short Caption:WILLIAMS (RONALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45904 , 49648 , 50144 , 51519 , 55368 , 55567 , 59093 , 59389 , 72099 , 73712 , 73712-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C197042Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. clerk7 06/01/06 Order: No. 45991 administratively closed; transferred the original document from No. 45991 to No. 45904. Nos. 45904/45991 cases are not consolidated.jcr
09/23/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) clerk7 06/01/06 Order: No. 45991 administratively closed; transferred the original document from No. 45991 to No. 45904. Nos. 45904/45991 cases are not consolidated.jcr 05-18990
09/23/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. clerk7 06/01/06 Order: No. 45991 administratively closed; transferred the original document from No. 45991 to No. 45904. Nos. 45904/45991 cases are not consolidated.jcr 05-18991
10/03/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment/Order Appealed from filed 9/22/05. Due Date: 10 days. clerk7 06/01/06 Order: No. 45991 administratively closed; transferred the original document from No. 45991 to No. 45904. Nos. 45904/45991 cases are not consolidated.jcr
10/11/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order/judgment of conviction filed in district court on September 22, 2005. clerk1 06/01/06 Order: No. 45991 administratively closed; transferred the original document from No. 45991 to No. 45904. Nos. 45904/45991 cases are not consolidated.jcr 05-20082
12/01/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. appellant's counsel Frank P. Kocka shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of the date of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. Clerk3 06/01/06 Order: No. 45991 administratively closed; transferred the original document from No. 45991 to No. 45904. Nos. 45904/45991 cases are not consolidated.jcr 05-23540
01/30/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Fast track statement and appendix due: 10 days or this court will order Kocka to appear personally before a single justice and show cause why he should not be held in contempt and sanctioned further, including referral to the State Bar. Clerk1 06/01/06 Order: No. 45991 administratively closed; transferred the original document from No. 45991 to No. 45904. Nos. 45904/45991 cases are not consolidated.jcr 06-02140
03/08/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to Appear. Frank P. Kocka has failed to file the fast track statement and appendix, or to respond to this court's order, or communicate with this court in any manner regarding this appeal. Kocka is ordered to appear personally before this court on April 10, 2006, at 2:00 p.m., in Las Vegas. Any evidence which Kocka desires to present on his behalf shall be filed in affidavit form on or before April 6, 2006. clerk1 06/01/06 Order: No. 45991 administratively closed; transferred the original document from No. 45991 to No. 45904. Nos. 45904/45991 cases are not consolidated.jcr 06-05035
03/23/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. and Vacating Order to Appear. We hereby vacate the directive that Kocka appear before this court on April 10, 2006. Nonetheless, the fact remains that Kocka failed to respond to the orders of this court to either file the fast track statement or show cause why he should not be sanctioned for his failure to do so. Further, Kocka failed to communicate to this court that two appeals from the same judgment had been docketed in this court. Accordingly, Kocka shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to file a written response showing cause why he should not be sanctioned for his failure to respond to this court's prior orders and inform this court that he was prosecuting this appeal in Docket No. 45904.clerk3 06/01/06 Order: No. 45991 administratively closed; transferred the original document from No. 45991 to No. 45904. Nos. 4594/45991 cases are not consolidated.jcr 06-06163
04/12/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. clerk3 06/01/06 Order: No. 45991 administratively closed; transferred the original document from No. 45991 to No. 45904. Nos. 45904/45991 cases are not consolidated.jcr 06-07722
05/11/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's counsel Frank P. Kocka filed a response on April 12, 2006. Upon review of the response, this court has concluded that sanctions are not warranted at this time. Clerk1 06/01/06 Order: No. 45991 administratively closed; transferred the original document from No. 45991 to No. 45904. Nos. 45904/45991 cases are not consolidated.jcr 06-09896
06/01/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order to Administratively Close Docket. Order Administratively Closing Appeal in Docket No. 45991. "Administratively closed." The clerk shall administratively close this appeal and transfer all documents filed in this matter to the pending proceeding in Docket No. 45904. No. 45904/45991 - cases are not consolidated. 06-11520
06/01/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. Administratively Closed. No remittitur issued.