Case: 10-14-00143-CV
10-14-00143-CV
05/19/2014
Labor
Sergio Felix Rodriguez
Kristopher L. Karstens
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/18/2015 | Reply brief filed | Appellant | |
09/03/2015 | Supplemental brief filed | Appellee | |
08/21/2015 | Amended brief filed | Appellant | |
04/13/2015 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee | |
02/11/2015 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/26/2016 | Case stored | | |||
02/26/2016 | Bill of costs | | |||
02/26/2016 | Mandate issued | | |||
11/12/2015 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
11/12/2015 | Retention time case file will be retained | | |||
11/12/2015 | Judgment Issued | | |||
11/12/2015 | Submitted | | |||
10/16/2015 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied | | |||
09/18/2015 | Reply brief filed | | |||
09/03/2015 | Supplemental brief filed | | |||
08/21/2015 | Amended brief filed | | |||
08/12/2015 | Motion to file amended brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||
07/22/2015 | Motion to file amended brief filed | | |||
04/13/2015 | Case ready to be set | | |||
04/13/2015 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||
04/10/2015 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||
03/18/2015 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||
03/13/2015 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
02/11/2015 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||
02/05/2015 | Notice of late brief | | |||
01/07/2015 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion granted; further extensions disfavored | | ||
01/05/2015 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
12/12/2014 | Notice of late brief | | |||
10/15/2014 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||
10/10/2014 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
09/11/2014 | Reporters record filed | | |||
08/27/2014 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion granted; further extensions disfavored | | ||
08/20/2014 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||
08/20/2014 | Motion disposed | Dismissed as moot | | ||
08/11/2014 | Motion filed | | |||
08/04/2014 | Letter requesting attorney to comply on payment and/or designation of record | | |||
08/04/2014 | Clerks record filed | | |||
07/31/2014 | Letter received | | |||
05/27/2014 | Objection filed | | |||
05/21/2014 | Notice filed | | |||
05/20/2014 | Appearance of counsel | | |||
05/19/2014 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
05/19/2014 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||
05/12/2014 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/26/2022 | Case Stored | Send 6 year letter in cv cases |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Rodriguez, Sergio Felix | Appellant | Daniel Hernandez Keith C. Livesay Daniel M.L. Hernandez |
Karstens, Kristopher L. | Appellee | Clint F. Sare Scott J. Scherr |
Trial Court Information
272nd District Court
Brazos
Honorable Travis B. Bryan
13-002182-CV-272-A
Denise C. Phillips