judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BERND (LYLE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45993
Short Caption:BERND (LYLE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CR0505060Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/23/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 05-18996
10/03/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. District Court minutes. Due Date: 10 days
11/02/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 05-21618
11/02/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 05-21619
11/28/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 05-23342
01/24/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-01720
02/21/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-01966
02/21/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/09/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 28, 2006. 06-01966