judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARRISON (JOHNATHEN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45994
Short Caption:HARRISON (JOHNATHEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CR0505055Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/23/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 05-18999
09/26/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Sentencing, August 22, 2005. Court Reporter: Gloria Jean Smith. 05-19061
09/27/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. District court minutes and request for rough draft transcript. Due Date: 10 days
10/11/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. District Court Minutes. 05-20019
10/11/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 8/22/05. Court Reporter: Gloria Jean Smith. Filed in district court on: 9/16/05. 05-20021
11/02/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 05-21620
11/02/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 05-21628
11/28/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 05-23347
11/28/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 05-23350
02/09/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-02940
03/07/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-03938
03/07/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/24/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 15, 2006. 06-03938