judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EWING (TADZIU) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42053
Short Caption:EWING (TADZIU) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38399
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR002265Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/17/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 03-15561
09/22/2003Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 03-15782
09/29/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. 03-16192
10/16/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 03-17194
10/16/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols. 1 and 2. 03-17195
11/06/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 03-18529
02/11/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. For the reasons stated in the attached order of the district court, we "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP04S-MS/RR/WM 04-02649
03/09/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-02696
03/09/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/29/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 15, 2004. 04-02696