judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HINKLE, JR. (WILLIAM) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45996
Short Caption:HINKLE, JR. (WILLIAM) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 48458
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR4760Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/23/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 05-19003
10/10/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Nye County clerk regarding documents required for notice of appeal packets and requesting a copy ot the minutes in this case. 05-20031
10/12/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant's counsel shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The deadlines for the filing of documents are suspended until further order of this court. 05-20149
11/07/2005MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation for Enlargement of Time Within Which to Respond to the Courts Order to Show Cause. 05-21973
11/15/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Stipulation Approved. Response from appellant due: 20 days. 05-22508
12/12/2005MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 05-24219
01/12/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn3[The clerk of this court shall return to appellant unfiled all proper person documents appellant has submitted to this court in this matter.] NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-00833
01/12/2006Other Returned Unfiled Document. Letter w/attached copy of original complaint received October 18, 2005, to appellant William Clyde Hinkle, Jr.
03/03/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 12, 2006, this court filed an order dismissing this appeal. On January 24, 2006, we received a proper person letter requesting this court to reconsider the appeal. Appellant is represented by counsel and has not been granted permission to file documents in proper person. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled the proper person letter received on January 24, 2006. 06-04786
03/03/2006Other Returned Unfiled Document. Letter requesting Court to reconsider the appeal received on January 24, 2006 to appellant William Clyde Hinkle, Jr.
03/03/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-04796
03/03/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/09/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 6, 2006. 06-04796