judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARMAN (FORREST) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42052
Short Caption:HARMAN (FORREST) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR01P0581Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/11/2003How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/17/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-15557
09/17/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 27, 2001. Court Reporter: Judith Ann Schonlau. 03-15559
10/24/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 120 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] 03-17773
12/11/2003Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 03-20648
12/11/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/28/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that Harman is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn8[We have reviewed all documents that Harman has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this mater, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted. To the extent that Harman has attempted to present claims or facts in those submissions that were not previously presented in the proceedings below, we have declined to consider them in the first instance.] NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-09927
06/22/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-10358
06/22/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/04/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 24, 2004. 04-10358