judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

POTTS (RANDOLPH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45981
Short Caption:POTTS (RANDOLPH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 53463
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR050711Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/21/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 05-18795
11/02/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 7, 2005. 05-21572
11/09/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 05-22094
11/09/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. - Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3. 05-22095
11/30/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 05-23496
03/24/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-06227
04/18/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-07133
04/18/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/05/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 24, 2006. 06-07133