judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DEGIOVANNI (JEFFREY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45980
Short Caption:DEGIOVANNI (JEFFREY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 62996
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR050417Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/21/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 05-18793
09/21/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: August 25, 2005. Court Reporter: Carol Dotson. Filed in district court on: September 19, 2005. 05-18794
09/27/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 25, 2005. Court Reporter: Joan Marie Dotson. 05-19141
10/31/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 05-21428
10/31/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 05-21430
11/17/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 05-22685
02/09/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Vacating in Part, and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED IN PART AND VACATED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-02922
03/07/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-03937
03/07/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/17/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 8, 2006. 06-03937