judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BAUMANN VS. WERTHEIMER-BAUMANN

Case Information: 45950
Short Caption:BAUMANN VS. WERTHEIMER-BAUMANNCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV0402275Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/04/2005 / Weise, CathySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Jack Sullivan Grellman--check no. 4088.
09/19/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-18584
09/29/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. 08/31/05 Order and Entry of Order. Due Date: 10 days
10/04/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-19647
10/04/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Cathy Valenta Weise . (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/12/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 15, 2005. 05-20214
10/12/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Qualified Domestic Relations Order filed in district court on August 31, 2005. 05-20242
10/12/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Notice of Entry of Qualified Domestic Relations Order fiiled in district court on: August 31, 2005. 05-20243
10/13/2005MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Dismissal of Appeal. 05-20271
10/14/2005Notice/Outgoing Letter. Cathy Valenta Weise. (district court order)
10/19/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 05-20685
10/19/2005Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
10/19/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 05-20726
10/19/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Respondent Diane Wertheimer-Baumann hereby substitutes herself, in proper person, in place and in lieu of David L. Bolnick, Esq., in the above-entitled action. 05-20765