judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EDWARDS VS. DIRECT ACCESS, LLC

Case Information: 42055
Short Caption:EDWARDS VS. DIRECT ACCESS, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A468207Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/20/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/18/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Fee waived (order filed in district court on 10/2/03 granting appellant in forma pauperis status).
09/18/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-15662
09/19/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days.
09/24/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. A468207: 120 days. fn2[See NRAP 11(a)(2) (providing that the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.)] The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 03-16005
09/30/2003Other Returned Mail. Receipt for Documents dated 09/18/03 and Notice to Pay Filing Fee addressed to Paul Edwards remailed to corrected address.
10/14/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit and Order in Support of Motion to Proceed on Appeal in Forma Pauperis (filed in the district court on October 2, 2003). 03-17052
01/02/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. 04-00096
01/02/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/20/2004BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. 04-01111
01/20/2004Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Appellant's Appendix. 04-01113
02/23/2004BriefReceived Answering Brief. 04-03484
03/24/2004BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. 04-05526
03/24/2004Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Appellant's Reply Appendix. 04-05528
03/25/2004MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae. 04-05633
03/25/2004BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Brief of Amicus Curiae, Robert Biggerstaff. 04-05635
04/05/2004MotionReceived Response to Motion. Respondents' Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. 04-06177
05/20/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Briefs and Granting Motion to File an Amicus Curiae Brief. Our review of the briefs submitted to this court indicates that their consideration would assist us in resolving this appeal. We therefore direct the clerk of this court to file appellant's opening brief and appendix, provisionally received in this court on January 20, 2004; respondents' answering brief, provisionally received on February 23, 2004; and appellant's reply brief and appendix, provisionally received on March 24, 2004. In addition, this court has received a motion to allow Robert Biggerstaff, a telephone protection act scholar, to file an amicus curiae brief, which respondents oppose. Fn2-[ The clerk of this court shall file the motion and opposition thereto, provisionally received in this court on March 25 and April 5, 2004, respectively.] Having reviewed the proposed amicus brief, we conclude that it might also be helpful to this court's resolution of this appeal. We therefore grant the motion and direct the clerk of this to file the proposed amicus brief, provisionally received on March 25, 2004. 05-09902
05/20/2005BriefFiled Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. 04-01111
05/20/2005Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appellant's Appendix. 04-01113
05/20/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-03484
05/20/2005BriefFiled Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief 04-05526
05/20/2005Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appellant's Reply Appendix. 04-05528
05/20/2005MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae. 04-05633
05/20/2005MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondents' Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. 04-06177
05/20/2005BriefFiled Proper Person Brief. Brief of Amicus Curiae, Robert Biggerstaff. 04-05635
09/20/2005Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision. Resubmitted on briefs. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP06-WM/MG/JH
12/29/2005Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before Maupin, Gibbons and Hardesty, JJ. Author: Hardesty, J. We concur: Maupin and Gibbons, JJ. 121 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 89. SNP06 05-25333
01/23/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Approving Bill of Costs. On January 9, 2006, appellant submitted a proper person bill of costs. fn1[We direct the clerk to file the proper person bill of costs received on January 9, 2006.] We approve appellant's bill in the amount of $203.53. The clerk shall issue a memorandum of costs in the amount of $205.53 for insertion in the remittitur. 06-01596
01/23/2006Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Bill of Costs. 06-00464
01/24/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Memorandum of Cost and Disbursements allowed and taxed in the amount of $203.53. 06-00740
01/24/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/01/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 27, 2006. 06-00740