judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LIKE (JAMES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45972
Short Caption:LIKE (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36254 , 41628 , 42383 , 53525
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C117900Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Douglas, GibbonsCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:02/06/2007 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:02/06/2007How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2005OtherDisqualification of Justice Gibbons.
09/20/2005OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings.
09/20/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-18713
10/11/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/12/05 and 08/04/05. To Court Reporter: Sharon Howard and Sherry Graham. 05-20005
10/11/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-20006
10/27/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 8/4/05. Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. 05-21341
01/17/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 60 days requested. 06-01140
01/19/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening brief and appendix due: March 20, 2006. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 06-01281
02/08/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 04/12/05. Court Reporter: Sherry Graham. 06-02844
03/22/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-06137
03/22/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 06-06138
04/24/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. 06-08631
05/22/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. 06-10744
06/09/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 06-12086
06/09/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/02/2006MotionFiled Motion. Request for Oral Argument. 06-16002
08/09/2006MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Request for Oral Argument. 06-16499
08/15/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is hereby scheduled before the En Banc Court on October 9, 2006, at the hour of 9:00 a.m., in Carson City. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. fn1[In light of this order, we deny appellant's request for oral argument as moot.] 06-16966
08/15/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on October 9, 2006, at 9:00 a.m. (En Banc)
09/26/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
10/06/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. we hereby vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for October 9, 2006, at 9:00 a.m. This appeal shall stand submitted for decision without oral argument as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 06-20582
10/12/2006MotionFiled Motion. Second Request for Oral Argument. 06-20865
10/24/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to reschedule en banc oral argument. The clerk shall reschedule this appeal for oral argument on this court's next available en banc argument calendar. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. 06-21848
11/28/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on February 6, 2007, at 11:30 a.m. (En Banc)
01/17/2007BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Respondent's Supplemental Memorandum. 07-01187
01/23/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/31/2007BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Appellant's Response to Respondent's Supplemental Memorandum. 07-02543
02/06/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. EN BANC.
04/06/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn12[The Honorable Mark Gibbons and the Honorable Michael Douglas, Justices, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC-WM/JH/RP/MC/NS 07-07698
05/02/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-08392
05/02/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/09/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 4, 2007. 07-08392
07/16/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on July 3, 2007 and placed on the docket as Case No. 07-5164. 07-15377
10/09/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. 07-22368