judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CRAWLEY VS. WELLS FARGO AUTO FINANCE

Case Information: 42059
Short Caption:CRAWLEY VS. WELLS FARGO AUTO FINANCECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0301480Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/10/2003How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/19/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-15669
09/24/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. CV0301480: 120 days. fn2[See NRAP 11(a)(2) (providing that the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.)] The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 03-16009
12/10/2003Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 03-20580
12/10/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/15/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's order." SNP04D-RR/WM/MD 04-19114
11/09/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-19645
11/09/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/01/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 10, 2004. 04-19645