Case: WR-83,362-02
WR-83,362-02
07/24/2015
11.07 HC
HOLTE, LESLIE KENNETH II
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/30/2015 | MANDATE ISSD | OUT OF TIME PDR GRANTED |
| ||||
11/04/2015 | OPINION ISSD | HC Relief granted |
| ||||
11/04/2015 | SUBMITTED FILE AND SET WRIT | | |||||
11/04/2015 | SET FOR SUBMIS | | |||||
11/04/2015 | WRIT FILED | | |||||
11/04/2015 | ACTION TAKEN | File and set | | ||||
10/13/2015 | SUPP RECD |
| |||||
08/26/2015 | ORDER ISSUED | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits |
| ||||
07/24/2015 | WRIT RECEIVED |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/04/2016 | STORED | CASE STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
HOLTE, II, LESLIE KENNETH | Applicant |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-12-00338-CR
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
263rd District Court
Harris
1318785-A