judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JEAN (ANTIONE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45968
Short Caption:JEAN (ANTIONE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42973 , 43975 , 44174 , 45329 , 45409 , 47765
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C183727Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/08/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-18703
10/25/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 05-21175
12/08/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3. 05-24064
12/08/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/10/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-00654
02/07/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-01372
02/07/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/02/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 9, 2006. 06-01372