judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WALKER (BERNARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45969
Short Caption:WALKER (BERNARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C207008Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/16/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-18710
10/25/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 05-21177
12/16/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 05-24510
12/16/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/16/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-03445
03/15/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-04312
03/15/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/24/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 17, 2006. 06-04312