judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LIBERTY MUTUAL VS. DAVIS

Case Information: 45984
Short Caption:LIBERTY MUTUAL VS. DAVISCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A499007Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/07/2005 / Roitman, HowardSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:02/09/2007 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:02/09/2007How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/22/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Santoro, Driggs, Walch, Kearney, Johnson & Thompson--check no. 12746.
09/22/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-18841
09/29/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-19374
10/07/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Howard Roitman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/18/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 05-20585
12/12/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 05-24203
12/19/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 05-24567
01/11/2006Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 06-00825
03/27/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix.
04/06/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-07351
04/06/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 06-07353
05/01/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. 06-09162
05/05/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Order of Errata. (Errata to Appellant's Opening Brief.) 06-09512
05/05/2006Other Other. Received Corrected Appellant's Appendix Volume I. (Corrected Index to Appellant's Appendix.) Attached to inside front cover of appendix. 06-09513
05/31/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. 06-11450
06/05/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. Original copy of reply brief previously filed on 05/31/06. 06-11450
12/15/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on February 9, 2007, at 9:30 a.m. (SNP07-MG/MD/MC)
01/25/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 07-01955
02/09/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP07-MG/MD/MC
03/07/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP07-MG/MD/MC 07-05441
04/03/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-07142
04/03/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/12/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 5, 2007. 07-07142