judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TORRES, JR. (NARCISO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45982
Short Caption:TORRES, JR. (NARCISO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 50698 , 76459
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR041447Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/21/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 05-18797
09/27/2005TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 6/20/05 and 6/21/05. Court Reporter: Denise Phipps. 05-19153
10/12/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 05-20197
10/12/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. - Joint Appendix. 05-20198
11/02/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 05-21652
03/27/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-06423
04/21/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-07181
04/21/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/05/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 24, 2006. 06-07181