judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHAVEZ (ERIC) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45973
Short Caption:CHAVEZ (ERIC) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C204764Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 05-18716
09/20/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: no date given. Court Reporter: JoAnne Pierpont. Filed in district court on: September 15, 2005. 05-18717
10/11/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 12, 2005 and July 13, 2005. Court Reporter: Jo Anne Pierpont. 05-20030
11/02/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 7, 2005. 05-21570
11/07/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 05-21932
12/20/2005Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Response. 05-25041
12/29/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-25392
01/06/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 06-00387
01/13/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the fast track response and appendix provisionally submitted on December 20, 2005. 06-00942
01/13/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 05-25041
01/13/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 05-25042
05/02/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-09181
05/30/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-09564
05/30/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/07/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 1, 2006. 06-09564