judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LAVENDER (DONTA) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45974
Short Caption:LAVENDER (DONTA) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C183232Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/31/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-18718
09/30/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 05-19506
10/31/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 05-21462
10/31/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/06/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06R-MD/RR/RP 05-23862
01/03/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-00018
01/03/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/20/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 5, 2006. 06-00018