judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AGUILAR (ENCARNACION) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45966
Short Caption:AGUILAR (ENCARNACION) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42807
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C179565Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/21/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-18700
10/03/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of the record on appeal due: 60 days. 05-19532
10/11/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order/judgment of conviction filed in district court on October 3, 2005. 05-20108
11/21/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 4. 05-22932
11/21/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/11/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-00706
02/07/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-01395
02/07/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/02/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 9, 2006. 06-01395