judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CAPRI (RICHARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45965
Short Caption:CAPRI (RICHARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40867 , 41220 , 42714 , 44318 , 44374 , 44611 , 44655 , 45437 , 45925 , 47649 , 48303 , 62990
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C152948Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-18696
10/18/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 05-20550
11/15/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-20722
11/15/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 22, 2005. 05-20722