judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PALMER (ANTHONY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45986
Short Caption:PALMER (ANTHONY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 51462 , 52160 , 54976
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR010327Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/05/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/22/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/22/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-18851
09/30/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 05-19516
12/05/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 05-23706
12/05/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/10/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. Accordingly, we "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-03000
03/07/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-03945
03/07/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/17/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 8, 2006. 06-03945