judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ADAMS VS. AARGON COLLECTION AGENCY

Case Information: 45985
Short Caption:ADAMS VS. AARGON COLLECTION AGENCYCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 47613
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A494958Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/22/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Michele Adams--USPS M.O. no. 08830126855.
09/22/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 05-18848
10/03/2005Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. Transcripts Requested: 3/22, 6/19, 8/16, 9/1, 9/12, 9/13. Court Reporter: Jo Anne Pierpont. 05-19620
10/06/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 16, 2005. Court Reporter: JoAnne B. Pierpont. (submitted by Appellant Adams) 05-19850
10/31/2005BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 05-21393
11/17/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. As we lack jurisdiction over this appeal, " . . . we dismiss it." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 05-22698
12/07/2005Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Civil Proper Persons Amendments Motion for Statements of Facts Clerical Mistakes, Motion for Statements of Facts Cert Ord Class Reqeust for Comply and Reply Response. 05-23909
12/07/2005Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Amendment of Motion and Mtn Amendments of Clerks Records, Transcripts and Reporters Transcripts Clerical Mistakes. 05-23911
12/07/2005Other Other. Returned, with letter, US Postal Money Order no. 08831607974 in the amount of $40 to appellant Michele Adams. (No fee due for returning copies of documents.)
12/14/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-23382
12/14/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/19/2005Other Returned Unfiled Document. "Civil Proper Persons Motion for Order Entry Summary Judgments, Cert Order Class Settlements Cert Order, Stipulation Order, Compliance and Reply Order."
12/19/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Relief. In light of our November 17, 2005, order dismissing this appeal, we deny as moot any requests for relief contained in the documents filed on December 7, 2005. 05-24602
12/21/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 16, 2005. 05-23382
08/07/2006MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion to Vacate Order Dismissing Appeal and to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 45985/47613. 06-16415
09/08/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Dismissing Appeal In Docket No. 47613, Denying Motion To Vacate Dismissal Of Appeal In Docket No. 45985, And Denying Motion To Consolidate Appeals. On August 7, 2006 appellant filed a motion to vacate the dismissal of this appeal [in 45985] and to consolidate it with the one pending in docket no. 47613, which stems from the same underlying case. We deny appellant's motion to vacate the dismissal of the appeal in docket no. 45985. We also deny the motion to consolidate that appeal with docket no. 47613. Because this court lacks jurisdiction over appeals from matters arising in the justice's court, we lack jurisdiction over this appeal. Accordingly, 'we order the appeal in docket no. 47613 dismissed.' fn8-[we deny as moot all motions and requests for relief currently pending in docket nos. 45985 and 47613.] 06-18567