judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRANDIN VS. GOTTLIEB

Case Information: 45952
Short Caption:BRANDIN VS. GOTTLIEBCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38258 , 45836 , 46175
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0003618Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/2005 / Frey, NicholasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Perry & Spann--check no. 62102.
09/19/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-18593
09/27/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-19168
09/30/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Nicholas F. Frey . (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/13/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Affidavit of Mailing Docketing Statement to Settlement Judge. 05-20265
11/28/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 45836 and 45952 (not consolidated). 05-23262
12/08/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 45836, 45952 and 46175 (not consolidated) 05-24024
01/12/2006Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Order Consolidating Appeals and Reinstating Briefing. We consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of these matters. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Both appellants Gottlieb and Brandin: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a). Appellant in Nos. 45836 and 46175, Stephen P. Gottlieb: 90 days to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix. Nos. 45836/45952/46175. (06-00886)
01/25/2006Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Appellant Gottlieb. Nos. 45836/45952/46175 (06-01835).
01/26/2006MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal No. 45952. Nos. 45836/45952/46175 [06-01999]
01/27/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: July 13, 2005. To Court Reporter: Molezzo Court Reporters and Susan Kiger. Nos. 45836/45952/46175. (06-02054)
01/30/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Motion to Dismiss Appeal No. 45952. Nos. 45836/45952/46175
02/06/2006MotionFiled Response to Motion. Brandin's Opposition to Gottlieb's Motion to Dismiss Apeal No. 45952 and Cross-Motion for Determination of Appeal No. 45952 First (06-026078).
02/14/2006MotionFiled Response to Motion. Stephen Gottlieb's Opposition to Jill Brandin's "Cross-Motion for Determination of Appeal no. 45952 First." Nos. 45836/45952/46175 [06-03209]
02/14/2006MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dimiss Appeal No. 45952. Nos. 45836/45952/46175 [06-03213]
02/24/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. These are consolidated appeals. We grant appellant Gottlieb's motion and " . . . dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 45952." fn6[In light of this order, we deny Brandin's cross-motion, requesting that we consider Docket No. 45952 before considering Docket Nos. 45836 and 46175, and we deny Gottlieb's motion for leave to file a reply.] Nos. 45836/45952/46175. 06-04208
03/02/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 07/13/05. Court Reporter: Julie Ann Kernan. Nos. 45836/45952/46175 (06-04756).
03/22/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-04428
03/22/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/22/2006Other Other. On January 12, 2006, Docket Nos. 45836, 45952 and 46175 were consolidated. On February 24, 2006, an Order Dismissing Appeal was filed in Docket No. 45952 and the remittitur in this case was issued on March 22, 2006. As of March 22, 2006, only Docket Nos. 45836 and 46175 are consolidated.jcr 03/22/06
03/30/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 23, 2006. 06-04428