judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AGUILAR (ENCARNACION) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45967
Short Caption:AGUILAR (ENCARNACION) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40072 , 46809
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C178057Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 05-18702
11/16/2005MotionFiled Motion. Cristina A. Hinds 05-22622
12/02/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 8/15/05. Court Reporter: Stacy L. Briggs. 05-23661
12/08/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. to withdraw. Transcript request due: 10 days. Fast track statement and appendix due: 40 days. Failure to comply with this court's orders and the rules of appellate procedure may result in the imposition of sanctions. 05-23991
12/20/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 08/15/05. Court Reporter: Stacy Briggs. Not filed in district court. 05-24725
01/24/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 06-01751
01/24/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 06-01752
02/15/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 06-03367
03/24/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-06226
04/18/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-07132
04/18/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/05/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 21, 2006. 06-07132