judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JONES (CHRISTOPHER) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 45962
Short Caption:JONES (CHRISTOPHER) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 30756 , 43554 , 52503 , 53946 , 54863 , 55041 , 55106 , 62323 , 74459
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C128425Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/05/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-18681
10/25/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 05-21182
12/05/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 6. 05-23693
12/05/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/17/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn4[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-03581
03/15/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-04335
03/15/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/24/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 17, 2006. 06-04335