judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHAVEZ-VALENCIA (JORGE) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 45958
Short Caption:CHAVEZ-VALENCIA (JORGE) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38309
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR001732Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:HardestyCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/18/2006How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2005OtherDisqualification of Justice Hardesty. Sat in district court proceedings.
09/20/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-18659
09/26/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 09/01/05. Court Reporter: Cecilia Vohl. 05-19075
10/13/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts.
10/19/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Completed Proof of Service. 05-20680
10/31/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/01/05. To Court Reporter: Donna Davidson. 05-21395
10/31/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement. 05-21396
11/10/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 09/01/05. Court Reporter: Cecilia Vohl. 05-22139
01/27/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix.
02/08/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-02836
02/08/2006AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 06-02837
03/09/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. 06-05211
03/09/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Supplemental Joint Appendix, Vols. 1 and 2. 06-05212
04/18/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed.
06/29/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-13464
07/25/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-14446
07/25/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/31/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 26, 2006. 06-14446