judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RIOS (SIMON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45959
Short Caption:RIOS (SIMON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR030133Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 05-18660
09/23/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 28, 2005. Court Reporter: Joan Marie Dotson. 05-18963
10/31/2005MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 14 pages. 05-21475
10/31/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 05-21476
10/31/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 05-21477
11/14/2005MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave of Court to File Fast Track Response in Excess of Ten Pages. 05-22354
12/06/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the fast track response provisionally submitted on November 14, 2005. 05-23789
12/06/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 05-22356
05/19/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-10538
06/13/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-10917
06/13/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/22/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 14, 2006. 06-10917