judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DELGADO (ADAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45964
Short Caption:DELGADO (ADAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45713
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C204276Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 05-18694
09/21/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Notice of Appeal, Case Appeal Statement, and Request for Rough Draft Transcript. 05-18765
09/21/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 08/08/05 Court Reporter: Carlaya Lewis Filed in district court on: September 14, 2005. 05-18768
10/26/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 05-21214
10/26/2005AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 05-21215
11/09/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Submitted by counsel for respondent. Transcripts requested: 09/09/04. Court Reporter: Carlya Lewis. Not filed in district court. 05-22070
11/22/2005MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 12 pages. 05-23042
11/22/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 05-23043
11/22/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 05-23045
02/17/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-03591
03/15/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-04336
03/15/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/24/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 17, 2006. 06-04336