judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DREW VS. MANPOWER OF SOUTHERN NEVADA

Case Information: 45963
Short Caption:DREW VS. MANPOWER OF SOUTHERN NEVADACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A498975Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/13/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 05-18688
09/28/2005Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. Transcripts Requested: August 4, 2005. Court Reporter: Beverly Sigurnik. 05-19212
10/17/2005MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Stay Form for Parties without Attorneys. 05-20459
10/31/2005BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 05-21373
10/31/2005Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Affidavit Regarding Irregulartities Necessitating Filing of Additional Documents. 12/21/05 Order: documents attached to appellant's October 31 affidavit-STRICKEN.jcr 05-21425
11/21/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. A498975 due: 120 days. 05-22895
12/21/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Directing Response to Motion for Stay, and Denying Motion to Supplement the Record. Response from appellant due: 20 days. Respondent may file any reply within 10 days of the date that appellant's response is served. Respondent shall have 10 days to file a response to the stay motion. We may not consider matters outside of the district court record on appeal. fn5[We deny appellant's September 28, 2005 request for a transcript of the August 4, 2005 district court hearing.] We direct the clerk to strike the documents attached to appellant's October 32 affidavit. To the extent that appellant asserts that the district court record is incomplete, she should follow the procedure set forth in NRAP 10(c). fn7[The Honorable Deborah A. Agosti, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment entered on July 14, 2005.] 05-24826
01/03/2006MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Request for Appointment of Nevada Attorney for Injured Workers pursuant to Both NRS 616A.450 (1) and Supreme Court Order to Show Cause; in which Supreme Court Apparently Limits Consideration to the Administrative Record, where the Administrative Record is Comprised of all that was Litigated by the Nevada Attorney for Injured Workers. 06-00110
01/09/2006MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondent Manpower of Southern Nevada's Response to Appellant's Motion for Stay. 06-00483
01/12/2006MotionFiled Proper Person Response. Appellant/Worker's Compensation Claimant Complying with Order to Show Cause filed by Court December 21, 2005. 06-00861
02/23/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. for Stay and Motion for Appointment of Counsel, and Directing Response. We have considered the four factors and determined that a stay is not warranted. We deny appellant's motion for a stay. Response from respondent due: April 21, 2006. fn2[Respondent may cite to the record before this court in lieu of submitting an appendix.] We deny appellant's motion for appointment of counsel in this appeal. 06-03957
03/13/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 4. 06-05378
03/13/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/24/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent's Response to Appellant's Civil Appeal Statement. 06-08625
04/24/2006AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's Appendix (to Respondent's Response to Appellant's Civil Appeal Statement). 06-08626
06/30/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "We affirm the portion oft he district court's order denying Drew's petition for judicial review that relates to the propriety of suspending her benefits, and we reverse that portion of the district court's order that relates to the indefinite suspension. We remand this matter so that the district court may then remand to the appeals officer for modification of the order affirming the suspension of Drew's benefits in accordance with this order." fn12[The Honorable Miriam Shearing, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under general orders of assignment entered January 6, 2006.] SNP-SR-NB/RP/MS 06-13591
07/18/2006Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Appellant/Workers' Compensation Claimant's Petition for Rehearing of Nevada Supreme Court No. 45963. 06-14931
09/25/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. (Jill M. Lynne, Esq.) 06-19665
10/04/2006Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Supplement to Petition for Rehearing. Supplement to Appellant/Workers' Compensation Claimant's Petition for Rehearing of Nevada Supreme Court No. 45963. 06-20342
10/16/2006MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Motion to Supplement the Record. 06-21279
11/07/2006Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[NRAP 40(c).] fn2[We deny as moot respondent's motion to supplement the record.] SNP-SR-NB/RP/MS 06-22753
11/21/2006Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. 06-23883
12/05/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-24017
12/05/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/14/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 7, 2006. 06-24017
12/26/2006Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1-[The Honorables Robert E. Rose, Chief Justice, and Nancy A. Becker, Associate Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC 06-26377