judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

HARRY L. SEAY, ET AL. v. ARCH H. ROWAN, OTTO ATCHLEY, ET AL. (MAY NOMINEES), SIDNEY LATHAM, SECRETARY OF STATE

Case: A-338
A-338
09/08/1944
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
HARRY L. SEAY, ET AL.
ARCH H. ROWAN, OTTO ATCHLEY, ET AL. (MAY NOMINEES), SIDNEY LATHAM, SECRETARY OF STATE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/23/1944Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
09/22/1944Response to Brief filedRelator
09/21/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/21/1944Amended Brief filedRespondent
09/20/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
09/19/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/18/1944Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
09/18/1944Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
09/18/1944Supplement to Petition filedRelator
09/18/1944Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/23/1944Miscellaneous letter
09/23/1944Supplemental Brief filed
09/22/1944Response to Brief filed
09/21/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/21/1944Amended Brief filed
09/21/1944Letter Filed
09/20/1944Brief on the Merits
09/20/1944Response to Motion filed
09/20/1944Response to Motion filed
09/20/1944Response to Motion filed
09/19/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/18/1944Exhibits in case/cause filed
09/18/1944Brief in Support of Petition
09/18/1944Supplement to Petition filed
09/18/1944Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
09/18/1944Order from Lower Court filed
09/18/1944Order from Lower Court filed
09/08/1944Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. S. BramlettAmicus Curiae
Harry L. Seay, et al.Relator
Karl A. CrowleyAmicus Curiae
Otto Atchley, et al. (May Nominees)Respondent
Sidney Latham, Secretary of StateRespondent
Arch H. RowanRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information