judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JACOB PAUL MARTINEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0147)
Parent:S-07-0147Case Docketed On:07/09/2007
Consolidated: S-07-0148
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JACOB PAUL MARTINEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JACOB PAUL MARTINEZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJacob Paul Martinez Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 205
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/09/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/09/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - P. Craig Silva for Appellant.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
08/16/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/16/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/20/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counsel Tina N. KerinMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
08/20/2007Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
08/23/2007Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
08/24/2007Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
09/27/2007Brief - Anders; received copy of brief on cd and copy of designation of recordBriefAndersFinal
09/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk pursuant to filing of Anders briefNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/02/2007Record - Received unfiled record from District Court ClerkRecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
10/23/2007Order - Allowing court appointed counsel to withdraw, conditionally affirming judgment and sentenceOrderAllowing court appointed counsel to withdrawFinal
12/06/2007Brief - Appellant, pursuant to orderBriefAppellantFinal
12/19/2007Order - Other affirming judgment and sentence of the district courtOrderOtherFinal
01/07/2008Record - Returned unfiled record to district courtRecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
01/07/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/09/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal