judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEWIS VS. CABRERA-LAZO

Case Information: 45961
Short Caption:LEWIS VS. CABRERA-LAZOCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 49505 , 51372
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV0302180Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/16/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 05-18670
11/07/2005MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Emergency Motion for Stay of Execution. 05-21907
11/08/2005MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Extension of Time. 05-22004
11/23/2005Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. Transcripts Requested: August 3, 2005. Court Reporter: No reporter listed. 05-23107
12/08/2005BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 05-24042
12/08/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. 05-24069
02/21/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. and Denying as Moot Motion for Extension of Time. On November 8, 2005, appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file his transcript request form and civil proper person appeal statement. As both documents have already been filed, we deny as moot appellant's request for an extension of time. Record due in District Court Case No. DV0302180: 120 days. 06-03727
06/16/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. 06-12605
06/16/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/02/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's divorce decree." fn8[Lewis requests that we appoint counsel to represent him on appeal. We deny his request. We deny as moot Lewis' motion for a stay of execution, which was filed on November 7, 2005.] NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-02700
02/28/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Record on Appeal returned this day. 07-04402
02/28/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/06/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 2, 2007. 07-04402