judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WESTERN STATES COMPANIES VS. MILLS

Case Information: 45953
Short Caption:WESTERN STATES COMPANIES VS. MILLSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A502608Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/26/2005 / Osko, EugeneSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from The Law Office Of David H. Benavidez--check no. 3278.
09/19/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-18602
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 05-18636
09/20/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days.
09/26/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on 9/14/05. 05-19071
10/06/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-19841
10/26/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eugene Osko. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/14/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 05-24408
12/14/2005MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 05-24409
12/20/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 05-24716
12/20/2005Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.