judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-7896
B-7896
09/11/1978
Application for Writ of Error
BOB BULLOCK, COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS OF THE STATE OF TEXAS, ET AL.
NATIONAL BANCSHARES CORPORATION OF TEXAS, ET AL., REIDY INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/01/1979Writ of Certiorari filedRespondent
07/05/1979Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/05/1979Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/16/1979Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/02/1979Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/29/1979Post submission brief filedRespondent
10/26/1978Appendix FiledRespondent
10/26/1978Response to PetitionRespondent
09/11/1978Appendix FiledPetitioner
09/11/1978Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/07/1980Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
11/05/1979Motion to Stay Filed Filing granted
11/01/1979Writ of Certiorari filed
11/01/1979Motion to Stay Filed Filing granted
08/13/1979Motion to Stay Filed
08/07/1979Motion to Stay Filed
07/09/1979Response to Motion filed
07/05/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/05/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/20/1979Opinion issued
04/16/1979Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/02/1979Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/29/1979Post submission brief filed
02/28/1979Document received (See Remarks)
02/28/1979Document received (See Remarks)
02/28/1979Document received (See Remarks)
02/28/1979Document received (See Remarks)
10/26/1978Appendix Filed
10/26/1978Response to Petition
09/14/1978Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
09/11/1978Document received (See Remarks)
09/11/1978Appendix Filed
09/11/1978Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Republic of Texas CorporationAmicus Curiae
National Bancshares Corporation of Texas, et al.Respondent
Reidy International, Inc.Respondent
Bob Bullock, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas, et al.Petitioner
Scurlock Oil CompanyAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information