judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. WARRENGTON (ROBERT)

Case Information: 45948
Short Caption:STATE VS. WARRENGTON (ROBERT)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C209096Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Suppression
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/16/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/16/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal from Grant of Motion to Suppress. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-18519
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. 05-18706
09/30/2005MotionFiled Motion. Clark County Public Defender Office's Motion to Withdraw as Appellate Counsel based on Conflict of Interest. 05-19503
10/06/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Order to Show Cause and Granting Motion. Points and authorities due from appellant: 10 days. Respondent shall have 10 days thereafter to file opposing points and authorities. fn2[The deadlines for the filing of documents are suspended.] The Clark County Public Defender is relieved of any obligation with regard to this appeal. Notice of appearance from attorney Jonathan MacArthur due: 10 days. 05-19817
10/14/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Jonathan E. MacArthur, Esq. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. 05-20338
10/19/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Notice of Appearance. 05-20735
10/20/2005MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Points and Authorities in Support of Propriety of Appeal. 05-20801
10/20/2005AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Exhibits. 05-20802
10/24/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Points and Authorities. 05-21080
10/24/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Appellant's Appendix. 05-21082
10/31/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time. 05-21431
11/14/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed October 31, 2005. Respondent: 20 days to file opposing points and authorities. 05-22290
12/07/2005MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent's Points and Authoriteis in Opposition to Propriety of Appeal. 05-23938
12/23/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP06R-MD/RR/RP 05-25013
01/18/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-00544
01/18/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/30/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 24, 2006. 06-00544