judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SIERRA SCHOOLS CREDIT UNION VS. HALL

Case Information: 45949
Short Caption:SIERRA SCHOOLS CREDIT UNION VS. HALLCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0402703Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/2005 / Evans, MargaretSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-18561
09/19/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Michael Lehners--check no. 17939.
09/27/2005Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 05-19136
09/27/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-19172
09/28/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. (Removed Aaron Haaheim as a respondent.) Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties.
09/29/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Certificate of No Transcript Request. 05-19323
09/30/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Margaret Springgate Evans . (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/08/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 05-22043
11/08/2005MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 05-22044
12/05/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 05-23682
12/05/2005Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.